Boulos, Pauline (CPSO#: 72401)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Nov 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 201
17 King Street East
Dundas ON  L9H 1B7
Phone: (289) 238-9999
Fax: (289) 238-9992
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Chrisostomos Kouroukis & Dr. Pauline Boulos Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 24 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Boulos ( CPSO# 72401 )
Dr. C. Kouroukis ( CPSO# 70001 )

Business Address:
Juravinski Cancer Centre
Hematology Department
699 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 5C2
Phone Number: (905) 575-7820

Business Address:
201 - 17 King Street East
Dundas ON  L9H 1B7
Phone Number: (289) 238-9999

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 11 Nov 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PAULINE BOULOS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOULOS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Clinician Investigator

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Clinician Investigator

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Clinician Investigator

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Nov 1999