Bourassa-Blanchette, Samuel (CPSO#: 106740)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2015

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 01 Jul 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Department of Internal Medicine
Room 162
737 Parkdale Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 1J8
Phone: (613) 798-5555 Ext. 13050
Electoral District: 07

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SAMUEL BOURASSA-BLANCHETTE shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. BOURASSA-BLANCHETTE is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF OTTAWA;

(2) Dr. BOURASSA-BLANCHETTE shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. BOURASSA-BLANCHETTE is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. BOURASSA-BLANCHETTE shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. BOURASSA-BLANCHETTE is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. BOURASSA-BLANCHETTE no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018