Bourcier, Joanne Denise (CPSO#: 60706)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Feb 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Queen's University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Cornwall Community Hospital
840 McConnell Avenue
Cornwall ON  K6H 5S5
Phone: (613) 938-4240
Fax: (613) 930-4502
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Joanne Bourcier Medecine Societe Professionnelle

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 13 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Bourcier ( CPSO# 60706 )

Business Address:
Cornwall Community Hospital
840 McConnell Avenue
Cornwall ON  K6H 5S5
Phone Number: (613) 938-4240

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cornwall Community Hospital Cornwall

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 1991 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 05 Dec 1997 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOANNE DENISE BOURCIER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOURCIER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1989 to 14 Jun 1990
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Feb 1991