Bourdeau, Danielle (CPSO#: 64221)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Jul 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Laval University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
CAMH-MAAS
Bell Gateway Building
100 Strokes Street
4th Floor
Toronto ON  M6J 1H4
Phone: (416) 535-8501 Ext. 36316
Fax: (416) 979-6853
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health,Queen Street Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 25 May 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DANIELLE BOURDEAU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOURDEAU is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1992