Bourdeau, Gilles Viateur (CPSO#: 28196)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 09 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 09 Jun 2015


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Accuro Inc., Suite 411 1230 Old Innes Road, Ottawa, ON K1B 3V3
Date Received: 08 Jun 2015


Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 03 Nov 1975 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jun 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 09 Jun 2015