Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Bourdon, Christopher Antonio (CPSO#: 68456)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Jul 1994

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Health Sciences North
41 Ramsay Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone: (705) 523-7095
Fax: (705) 523-7041
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Christopher A Bourdon Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 26 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Bourdon ( CPSO# 68456 )

Business Address:
Sudbury Regional Hospital
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone Number: (705) 523-7100

Business Address:
825 McKinnon Drive
Espanola ON  P3E 1R4
Phone Number: (705) 869-1420


Corporation Name: Drs. Caruso, Christie and Bourdon Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 20 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Bourdon ( CPSO# 68456 )
Dr. A. Caruso ( CPSO# 68762 )
Dr. T. Christie ( CPSO# 88916 )

Business Address:
3557 Errington Avenue
Chelmsford ON  P0M 1L0

Business Address:
Health Sciences North
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone Number: (705) 675-4700

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 1991 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 09 Dec 1992 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER ANTONIO BOURDON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOURDON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1994