Bourgault, Klere Danielle (CPSO#: 72389)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
11790 Highway 64
Verner ON  P0H 2M0
Phone: (705) 594-2338
Fax: (705) 594-1361
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Klere Bourgault Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 22 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Bourgault ( CPSO# 72389 )

Business Address:
11790 Highway 64
Verner ON  P0H 2M0
Phone Number: (705) 594-2338

Business Address:
725 Coursol Road
Sturgeon Falls ON  P2B 2Y6
Phone Number: (705) 753-3110

Business Address:
50 College Drive
North Bay ON  P1B 5A4
Phone Number: (705) 474-8600

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay
West Nipissing General Hospital Sturgeon Falls

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 14 Jun 2000 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KLERE DANIELLE BOURGAULT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOURGAULT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 2000