Bourgeois, Jacqueline Marie (CPSO#: 65169)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Jul 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McMaster University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Cambridge Memorial Hospital
700 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 3G2
Phone: (519) 621-2330 Ext. 2452
Fax: (519) 740-4916
Electoral District: 03
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Department of Pathology
McMaster University
Medical Centre
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JACQUELINE MARIE BOURGEOIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOURGEOIS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - General Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1993