Bourke, Michael John Christopher (CPSO#: 68386)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 27 Oct 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 27 Oct 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Queensland, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Oct 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Oct 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Oct 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Oct 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Oct 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Oct 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 03 Oct 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Oct 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Oct 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Oct 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Oct 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Oct 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 05 Oct 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Oct 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Oct 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 03 Oct 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Oct 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Oct 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Oct 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Oct 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Oct 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Oct 2017