Bourns, Amy Elizabeth (CPSO#: 89028)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Mar 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Mar 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sherbourne Health Centre
333 Sherbourne St.
Toronto ON  M5A2S5
Phone: 4163244100 Ext. 5326
Fax: 4163244262
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Robert Bourns Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 17 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Bourns ( CPSO# 89028 )
Dr. R. Bourns ( CPSO# 28427 )

Business Address:
Halton Hills Family Health
171 Guelph Street
Georgetown ON  L7G 4A1
Phone Number: (905) 877-0233

Business Address:
Sherbourne Health Centre
333 Sherbourne Street
Toronto ON  M5A 2S5
Phone Number: (416) 324-4103

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Dec 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AMY ELIZABETH BOURNS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOURNS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Oct 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2009 to 31 Oct 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2011 to 31 Mar 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Mar 2011