Bourrier, Robert Gerald (CPSO#: 59838)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Dec 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sandy Hill Community Health Centre
221 Nelson Street
Ottawa ON  K1N 1C7
Phone: (613) 789-8458
Fax: (613) 789-8710
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 1990 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT GERALD BOURRIER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOURRIER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1988 to 14 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Dec 1989