Boursiquot, Philippe-Edouard (CPSO#: 87339)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Montreal, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Community Psychiatry Clinic
St. Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
West 5th Campus
100 West 5th Street
Hamilton ON  L8N 3K7
Phone: (905) 522-1155 Ext. 39781
Fax: (905) 521-6059
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 01 May 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PHILIPPE-EDOUARD BOURSIQUOT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOURSIQUOT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 6 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jun 2013