Boushey, Robin Paul (CPSO#: 69084)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital
General Campus Critical Care
CAC 7474, Box 203
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8899 Ext. 71724
Fax: (613) 737-8011
Electoral District: 07
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1910 St Laurent Blvd, Unit 29
Ottawa ON  K1G 1A4
Canada
Phone: 6136866656
Fax: (613) 248-9009
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Robin P. Boushey, Medicine, Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 29 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Boushey ( CPSO# 69084 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
General Campus, Critical Care
CAC 7474, Box 203
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-8899

Business Address:
Suite 29
1910 St-Laurent Boulevard
Ottawa ON  K1G 1A4
Phone Number: (613) 686-6656

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBIN PAUL BOUSHEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOUSHEY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 31 Dec 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2004 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2003