Boutros, Hedy Nassif (CPSO#: 64252)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 27 Mar 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 27 Mar 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Cairo, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Victoria Medical Group, Unit 205-206, 1719 Lawrence Ave East, Scarborough, ON M1R 2X7
Date Received: 27 Mar 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 28 May 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 1 - Anatomical Pathology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Anatomical Pathology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Anatomical Pathology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Pathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 31 Dec 1996
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1997
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 27 Mar 2015