Bouttell, Elaine Sarah (CPSO#: 71158)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Nov 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Nov 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone: 905-895-4521
Fax: 905-952-2820
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: E. S. Bouttell Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 05 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Bouttell ( CPSO# 71158 )

Business Address:
115 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 4J4
Phone Number: (519) 837-6440

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 12 Sep 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ELAINE SARAH BOUTTELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOUTTELL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Nov 2001
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 08 Jul 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Nov 2007