Bouvier, Stephanie Marcelle Marie (CPSO#: 102825)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 May 2016

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 11 May 2016

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: Bouvier Le Manach, Stephanie Marcelle Marie (used until: 10 May 2016 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Paris, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McMaster University
Department of Surgery
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone: 2894390632
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 11 May 2016 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Apr 2014 to 23 Jun 2014
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

McMaster University, 24 Jun 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Sep 2014
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Oct 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 17 Apr 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 11 May 2016
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 11 May 2016 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Stephanie Marcelle Marie Bouvier may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Surgery,
                        Division  of  Otolaryngology,  McMaster  University,  in  which Dr.
                        Bouvier  holds  an  academic  appointment  at the rank of Assistant
                        Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires  seven  years  from
                  the  date  of  issuance or when Dr. Bouvier  no longer holds the academic
                  appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

            3.    The certificate  of registration automatically expires upon the following
                  events, unless the  Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the  College  receives  a  report  indicating  that  Dr.  Bouvier's
                        clinical  performance,  knowledge,  skill,  judgment,  professional
                        conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (ii)  the Committee  does  not  receive  an  annual  report or receives a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. Bouvier's certificate
                        of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment
                        report. 
                  
            Note: This certificate is issued on May 11, 2016, and expires on June 30, 2018.
                  Upon   renewal   of  Dr.  Bouvier's  academic  appointment  at   McMaster
                  University, the expiry  date  can be extended, subject to the limitations
                  in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.