Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Bovell, Keith Trenton (CPSO#: 53684)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Jan 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Jan 1984

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
201-49 Emma St
Guelph ON  N1E 6X1
Phone: (519) 763-1220
Fax: (519) 763-2144
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: K. T. Bovell Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 27 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Bovell ( CPSO# 53684 )

Business Address:
201 - 49 Emma Street
Guelph ON  N1E 6X1
Phone Number: (519) 763-1220

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Guelph General Hospital Guelph

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 25 Jun 1986 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 18 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KEITH TRENTON BOVELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOVELL is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jan 1984