Bowden, James Alexander George (CPSO#: 55027)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 1998

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Jun 1995 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Dec 1984
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Jan 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 1988
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1998