Bowden, Lois Alberta (CPSO#: 55586)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 31 May 1989

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1987 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Mar 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Oct 1988
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 May 1989