Bowdler, Ann Rogers (CPSO#: 27633)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Sep 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Sep 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Instructions: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical records can be advised that charts remain with the clinic that Dr. Bowdler saw the patient at.
Date Received: 30 Jul 2013


Instructions: Records will remain at the clinic where Dr. Bowdler saw the patient.
Date Received: 30 Jul 2013

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANN ROGERS BOWDLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOWDLER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1967
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 1975
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 10 Aug 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Sep 2017