Bowen, Julie Lynn (CPSO#: 56039)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Aug 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Aug 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
NECC
HSN
41 Ramsey Lk Rd
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone: (705) 522-6237 Ext. 2451
Fax: (705) 523-7329
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Julie L. Bowen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 20 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Bowen ( CPSO# 56039 )

Business Address:
N E Ontario Regional Cancer Centre
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone Number: (705) 522-6237


Corporation Name: Pearce, Andronowski and Want Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 6 2015


Corporation Name: Want and Carlson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 4 2016

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste Marie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 14 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JULIE LYNN BOWEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOWEN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1988
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Apr 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Apr 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Aug 1992