Bowen, Nadia Anne (CPSO#: 86245)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Jan 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jan 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sault Area Hospital
SAH Hospitalist Program
750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 0A8
Phone: (705) 759-3434 Ext. 5352
Fax: (705) 759-3731
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nadia Bowen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 16 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Bowen ( CPSO# 86245 )

Business Address:
Sault Area Hospital
SAH Hospitalist Program
750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 0A8
Phone Number: (705) 759-3434

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste Marie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Dec 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NADIA ANNE BOWEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOWEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 20 Aug 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 19 Aug 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jan 2010