Bowler, Adrian Peter (CPSO#: 30506)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of London, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: RSRS Canada 111 St. Regis Crescent South Toronto ON M3J 1Y6 Tel: 1-888-563-3732 Email: info@rsrs.com
Date Received: 02 Mar 2017

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Sep 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Underserviced Area Practice Certificate Effective: 21 May 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Dec 1978
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017