Bowler, Lynne Marie (CPSO#: 65558)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Jul 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Queen Elizabeth Hospital
Department of Pathology
60 Riverside Drive
Charlottetown PE  C1A 8T5
Phone: (902) 894-2328

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Prince Edward Island

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 02 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LYNNE MARIE BOWLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOWLER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Anatomical Pathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Anatomical Pathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 1993