Bowles, Marjorie Jean (CPSO#: 50187)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: G.H. Percy Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 5 2016

Medical Records Location

Address: Unit 308, 75 Songhees Road, Victoria, BC, V9A 7M5
Date Received: 26 May 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1984 CFPC Specialist
FCFP - Family Medicine Effective: 01 Dec 2004 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1982
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 1984
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016