Bowmer, James Luke (CPSO#: 20905)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Liverpool, 1956

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Apr 1967
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 1967
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 15 May 1972
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Aug 1984
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2005