Boyal, Komaldeep Kaur (CPSO#: 105048)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Oct 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Oct 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:Windsor University, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1060 speers road
Suite 115
Oakville ON  L6L 2X4
Phone: (905) 845-8884
Electoral District: 04

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Oct 2016 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KOMALDEEP KAUR BOYAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOYAL is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 21 Oct 2014 to 12 Jan 2015
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 13 Jan 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 20 Oct 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 21 Oct 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 20 Oct 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 21 Oct 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jan 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Oct 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Oct 2016