Boyce, Debra Elizabeth (CPSO#: 59666)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Feb 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 302
170 Simcoe Street
Peterborough ON  K9H 2H7
Phone: (705) 741-1191
Fax: (705) 741-1192
Electoral District: 06

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 1990 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DEBRA ELIZABETH BOYCE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOYCE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1988 to 14 Jun 1989
Other - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Feb 1990