Boyce, Frank George (CPSO#: 21868)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 21 Jun 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 21 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 May 1969
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 04 Aug 1972
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Nov 1978
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 06 Oct 2011
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 21 Jun 2012