Boyd, April Jean (CPSO#: 73836)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 23 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 20 Sep 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 21 Sep 2000 to 20 Sep 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 21 Sep 2001 to 20 Sep 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 21 Sep 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 6 - Vascular Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 6 - Vascular Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 7 - Vascular Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 05 Sep 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 Sep 2003
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 04 Sep 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2004
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2007