Boyd, Barbara Joan (CPSO#: 56908)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Aug 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Aug 1988

Summary

Former Name: Meske, Barbara Joan (used until: 15 Jul 1987 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 204
99 Kakulu Road
Kanata ON  K2L 3C8
Phone: (613) 592-1269
Fax: (613) 592-1141
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Barbara J. Boyd Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 04 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Boyd ( CPSO# 56908 )

Business Address:
Suite 204
99 Kakulu Road
Kanata ON  K2L 3C8
Phone Number: (613) 592-1269

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1988 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BARBARA JOAN BOYD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOYD is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1986
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Aug 1988