Boyd, John Brian (CPSO#: 32318)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 13 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 13 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Liverpool, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 2862 Palos Verdes Drive North Rolling Hills CA 90274 United States
Date Received: 13 Jun 2016

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - California

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 23 Nov 1981 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 May 1981
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 13 Jun 2016