Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Boyd, Michele Nicole (CPSO#: 70160)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hotel Dieu Hospital
166 Brock St.
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone: (613) 544-3400 Ext. 3326
Fax: (613) 545-1364
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michele Boyd Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 24 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Boyd ( CPSO# 70160 )

Business Address:
Hotel Dieu Hospital
Psychiatry Department
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone Number: (613) 544-3400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHELE NICOLE BOYD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOYD is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2001