Boyd, Stephanie Mary (CPSO#: 85977)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Dec 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Dec 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Grand River Hospital
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2T 1G3
Phone: (519) 894-8346
Electoral District: 03
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Kelowna General Hospital
2268 Pandosy Street
Kelowna BC  V1Y 1T2
Canada
County: 
Electoral District: 
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. M. Boyd Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 29 2015

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 21 Jun 2007 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 09 Oct 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEPHANIE MARY BOYD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOYD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 08 Mar 2007 to 04 Apr 2007
Elective Trainee - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 13 Dec 2007 to 09 Jan 2008
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Mar 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 Apr 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Dec 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 09 Jan 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Dec 2008