Boyd, Tristan Alexander (CPSO#: 90462)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Sep 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Sep 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:St George's University of Grenada, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Joseph's Health Care London
Rheumatology Division
268 Grosvenor Street, P.O. Box 5777
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone: 519-646-6140
Fax: 519-646-6118
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Tristan Boyd Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 28 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Boyd ( CPSO# 90462 )

Business Address:
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Health Care
Rheumatology Division
Suite D2-161
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone Number: (519) 646-6140

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5E9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 29 Oct 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TRISTAN ALEXANDER BOYD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOYD is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 23 Sep 2009
Assessment Verification Period - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 24 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2015