Boyd, Walter Douglas (CPSO#: 53867)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Apr 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UC Davis Medical Center
2221 Stockton Blvd,
Cypress Building, Rm 2112
Sacramento CA  95817
United States
Phone: (916) 734-3861
Fax: (916) 734-3066

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - California
USA - Florida

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 13 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery Effective: 23 Nov 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WALTER DOUGLAS BOYD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOYD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1984 to 15 Jun 1985
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 1 - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 3 - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 5 - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 6 - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 6 - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Apr 1990