Boyden, Sheri Nadine (CPSO#: 78086)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Dec 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Dec 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Rideau Valley Health Centre
1221 Greenbank Road
Ottawa ON  K2J 5V7
Phone: (613) 258-8710
Fax: (613) 440-3238
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sheri Boyden Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 23 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Boyden ( CPSO# 78086 )

Business Address:
1221 Greenbank Road
Ottawa ON  K2J 5V7
Phone Number: (613) 258-8710

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Dec 2003 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHERI NADINE BOYDEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOYDEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Nov 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Dec 2002 to 30 Nov 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Nov 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Dec 2003