Boyer, Martin Israel (CPSO#: 59324)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Jul 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, German, Hebrew

Education:University of Toronto, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Orthopaedic Surgery
Barnes Hospital
425 S. Euclid
Suite 5505
St. Louis MO  63110
United States
Phone: (314) 747-2813
Fax: (314) 747-2600

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 13 Nov 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARTIN ISRAEL BOYER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOYER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1988 to 12 Jun 1989
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1989