Boyko, Robert Michael (CPSO#: 58261)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Oct 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
142 Nahani Way
Mississauga ON  L4Z 3J1
Phone: (905) 568-0355
Fax: (905) 568-0307
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. R.M. Boyko Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 03 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Boyko ( CPSO# 58261 )

Business Address:
142 Nahani Way
Mississauga ON  L4Z 3J1
Phone Number: (905) 568-0355

Business Address:
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 4N4
Phone Number: (905) 813-2200

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Aug 1989 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Oct 1990 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT MICHAEL BOYKO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOYKO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1987 to 13 Jun 1988
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Oct 1988