Boylan, Khrista Rea Anne (CPSO#: 73741)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ron Joyce Children's health Centre
237 Barton Street E
Hamilton Ontario
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 77250
Fax: (905) 521-7963
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Khrista Boylan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 23 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Boylan ( CPSO# 73741 )

Business Address:
Chedoke Child and Family Centre
HHS - McMaster Univ Medical Centre
1200 Main Street West
P O Box 2000
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Chedoke Hospital Site Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KHRISTA REA ANNE BOYLAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOYLAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2004