Boyle, Anne Bernadette (CPSO#: 61821)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Jul 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jul 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
c/o Palliative Care
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone: (905) 522-1155 Ext. 33529
Fax: (905) 521-6108
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Chedoke Hospital Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 1990 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANNE BERNADETTE BOYLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOYLE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Nov 2003 to 31 Oct 2004
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Jan 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 26 Feb 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1990