Boyle, David Arthur (CPSO#: 26211)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University of Belfast, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David A. Boyle Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 9 2013

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 05 Nov 1973 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Oct 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2013