Boyle, David Lionel (CPSO#: 33319)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Jun 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Jun 1982

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Health Sciences North
(Sudbury Regional Hospital)
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone: (705) 522-2200 Ext. 8303
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David Lionel Boyle Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 15 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Boyle ( CPSO# 33319 )

Business Address:
Health Sciences North
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone Number: (705) 674-4733

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 04 Jun 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID LIONEL BOYLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOYLE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jun 1982