Boyle, Karl Oliver (CPSO#: 94258)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 05 Aug 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 05 Aug 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Dublin Trinity College, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Karl Boyle Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 19 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Boyle ( CPSO# 94258 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Division of Neurology
Room C408A
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-6100

Medical Records Location

Address: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Health Records E123 2075 Bayview Avenue Toronto ON M4N 3M5
Date Received: 02 Jun 2017

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

United Kingdom

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2010 to 23 Oct 2010
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Neurology

University of Toronto, 24 Oct 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 26 Nov 2013
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Oct 2015
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 05 Aug 2017