Boyle, Stefan Rene (CPSO#: 67980)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Jul 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
N113, CDU 1
Garrison Medical Clinic Petawawa
P O Box 9999
Station Main
Petawawa ON  K8H 2X3
Phone: (613) 687-5511 Ext. 3743
Fax: (613) 588-4880
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

154 Civic Centre Road
Petawawa ON  K8H 3H5
Canada
Phone: (613) 687-7641
Fax: (613) 687-6808
County: County of Renfrew
Electoral District: 07

2175 Petawawa Boulevard, Suite # 1
Pembroke ON  K8A 7G8
Canada
Phone: (613) 687-1499
County: County of Renfrew
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Stefan Boyle Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 05 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Boyle ( CPSO# 67980 )

Business Address:
1 - 2175 Petawawa Boulevard
Pembroke ON  K8A 7G8
Phone Number: (613) 687-1499

Business Address:
N113, CDU 1
Garrison Medical Clinic Petawawa
P.O. Box 9999
Station Main
Petawawa ON  K8H 2X3
Phone Number: (613) 687-5113

Business Address:
154 Civic Centre Road
Petawawa ON  K8H 3H5

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Pembroke Regional Hospital Pembroke

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1996 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEFAN RENE BOYLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOYLE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1996