Bozanovic, Radenka (CPSO#: 86900)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Aug 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Aug 2013

Summary

Former Name: Bozanovic-Sosic, Radenka (used until: 19 Aug 2007 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Bosnian, English

Education:University of Sarajevo, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hamilton Health Sciences
Department of Anatomical Pathology
1200 Main Street W
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 73645
Fax: (905) 577-0198
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 May 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RADENKA BOZANOVIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOZANOVIC is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 2013