Bozek, Nancy Leigh (CPSO#: 63715)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Nov 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
348 Muskoka Road 3 North
Suite 202
Huntsville ON  P1H 1H8
Phone: (705) 788-3623
Fax: (705) 788-3624
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David McLinden and Nancy Bozek Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 25 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. D. McLinden ( CPSO# 63654 )
Dr. N. Bozek ( CPSO# 63715 )

Business Address:
202 - 348 Muskoka Road 3 North
Huntsville ON  P1H 1H8
Phone Number: (705) 788-3623

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare,Huntsville District Memorial Hospital Huntsville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1993 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NANCY LEIGH BOZEK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOZEK is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Nov 1992