Bozek, Thomas (CPSO#: 56442)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 28 Aug 1989

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Oxford University, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Nov 1985
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 21 Nov 1985
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 20 Nov 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Sep 1986
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Oct 1987
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 28 Oct 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Aug 1989