Bozyk, Kevin Stanley (CPSO#: 30901)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 24 Jun 2013

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
212 Fourth Ave.S
Kenora ON  P9N 1Y9
Phone: (807) 467-8770
Fax: (807) 467-2666
Electoral District: 09

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lake of the Woods District Hospital Kenora
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Sep 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 1983
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 04 Nov 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2013

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 24 Jun 2013 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr.  Kevin  Stanley  Bozyk may practise medicine independently in general
                  practice, only.

            2.    Dr. Bozyk must work in  a  multi-doctor  practice  for  the  majority  of
                  professional work.