Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Brabant, Gordon Val (CPSO#: 57871)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 13 Aug 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 13 Aug 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 307
1235 Trafalgar Road
Oakville ON  L6H 3P1
Electoral District: 04

Medical Records Location

Address: 11 Pilon Avenue Beaconsfield, QC H9W 5P9
Date Received: 13 Aug 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 19 Nov 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jan 1987
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 13 Aug 2014